This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 12:08:32 (UTC).

THOMAS FOUR INC A FLORIDA CORP VS AMORIN, ANDREA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 THOMAS FOUR INC A FLORIDA CORP filed an Other lawsuit against AMORIN, ANDREA. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS FOUR INC

Defendants

AMORIN, ANDREA

DOE, JOHN

DOE, JANE

TRUHOME SOLUTIONS LLC

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

YOUNG, JOEL S

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA CORPORATION

DBA SERVICEMASTER OF CITRUS CO

IF ALIVE AND IF DEAD HIS UNKNO

LEGATEES GRANTEES ASSIGNS LIEN

TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS AN

PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANT,

IF ALIVE AND IF DEAD HER UNKNO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CZAYA, ADAM ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

MINTER, MATTHEW GUY

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/05/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFTS JOEL S YOUNG AND ANDREA AMORIN

12/24/2021:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFTS JOEL S YOUNG AND ANDREA AMORIN

MOTION-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND RELEASE OF LIEN FILED BY DEFTS JOEL S YOUNG AND ANDREA AMORIN

12/23/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND RELEASE OF LIEN FILED BY DEFTS JOEL S YOUNG AND ANDREA AMORIN

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

12/20/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

12/20/2021:ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOHN DOE

12/06/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOHN DOE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANE DOE

12/06/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANE DOE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY

12/06/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ANDREA AMORIN

12/06/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ANDREA AMORIN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOEL S YOUNG

12/06/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOEL S YOUNG

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

12/02/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/02/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFTS JOEL S YOUNG AND ANDREA AMORIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND RELEASE OF LIEN FILED BY DEFTS JOEL S YOUNG AND ANDREA AMORIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOHN DOE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANE DOE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF MARION COUNTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ANDREA AMORIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOEL S YOUNG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $462.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021

DocketCase 422021CC001602CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/30/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less