This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/23/2022 at 22:32:58 (UTC).

The Landings of the Withlacooc VS BASKIN FIRST SUCESSOR TRUSTEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 The Landings of the Withlacooc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BASKIN FIRST SUCESSOR TRUSTEE. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Landings of the Withlacooc

Defendants

CRITCHLEY, JOSEPH EDWARD

BASKIN FIRST SUCESSOR TRUSTEE

JENNIGS III AS SECOND SUCESSOR

BUSHER AS THIRD SUCESSOR TRUS,

TENANT, UNKNOWN

Not Classified By Court

OF UNRECORDED TRUST AGREEMENT,

Association Inc a Florida not

DATED THE 12TH OF SEPTEMBER A

AND KNOWN AS JOSEPH EDWARD CRI

CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, KAREN ANN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/29/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED LIS PENDENS

09/29/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $50.00 Receipt Number XX 785908

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 784717

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA002034CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less