This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/03/2019 at 22:31:14 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN T. KING

KING, JOHN T

UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSIO

RITTER, KELLEY

Not Classified By Court

INCLUDING IF A NAMED DEFENDANT

IS UNKNOWN CLAIMING UNDER ANY

FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TR

PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES THE S

PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN

OR DESCRIBED DEFENDANTS

DEFENDANT AND ALL CLAIMANTS PE

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES CREDIT

NATURAL OR CORPORATE OR WHOSE

CERTIFICATES SERIES 2004-AB2

CERTIFICATEHOLDERS OF CWABS IN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER, BRIAN LEE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED JOHN KING

12/02/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED JOHN KING

COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED

11/14/2019:COURT REGISTRY-FULLY DISBURSED

MOTION-MOTION AMENDED FOR CONTINUANCE OF FORECLOSURE SALE DATE FILED BY DEFT JOHN T KING

10/08/2019:MOTION-MOTION AMENDED FOR CONTINUANCE OF FORECLOSURE SALE DATE FILED BY DEFT JOHN T KING

MOTION- MOTION TO CANCEL SALE AND RESCHEDULE SALE FILED BY DEFT JOHN TAYLOR KING

09/27/2019:MOTION- MOTION TO CANCEL SALE AND RESCHEDULE SALE FILED BY DEFT JOHN TAYLOR KING

MOTION- REO: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND/OR MOTION FOR REHEARING FILED BY DEFT JOHN TAYLOR KING

09/27/2019:MOTION- REO: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND/OR MOTION FOR REHEARING FILED BY DEFT JOHN TAYLOR KING

RESPONSE TO PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT JOHN T KING

08/13/2019:RESPONSE TO PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT JOHN T KING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

07/24/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

ORDER ON MOTION PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

07/22/2019:ORDER ON MOTION PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

06/24/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AS TO FEES FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 NKA KELLEY RITTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOHN T KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketFACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO dismissed 04/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $937.50 Receipt Number XX 419380

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $937.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA000783CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/9/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES THE S is a litigant

Latest cases where NATURAL OR CORPORATE OR WHOSE is a litigant

Latest cases where PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UN is a litigant

Latest cases where FKA THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TR is a litigant