Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 21:08:30 (UTC).

TD BANK USA NA VS YAHL, AMANDA

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 TD BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YAHL, AMANDA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR, R MCCUNE and MCCUNE, R JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR

R MCCUNE

MCCUNE, R JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK USA NA

Defendant

YAHL, AMANDA

Ocala, FL 34479-6500

Not Classified By Court

AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORNARO, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

04/13/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

EFILED SUMMONS

04/13/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/13/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/13/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/01/2021 14:00; Judge: MCCUNE, R JAMES; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 06/01/2021 at 0200 PM - Judge R MCCUNE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number XX 628206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase 422021SC001626SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW