This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 02/12/2022 at 21:48:40 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS LIZARRAGA, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIZARRAGA, CARLOS. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR, R MCCUNE and MCCUNE, R JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR

R MCCUNE

MCCUNE, R JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

LIZARRAGA, CARLOS

Ocala, FL 34473-2324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

HERRERA-OSORIO, GUIANEYA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/19/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS

01/19/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/08/2022 16:00; Judge: MCCUNE, R JAMES; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 03/08/2022 at 0400 PM - Judge R MCCUNE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketJudge: MCCUNE , R JAMES Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 709383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase 422022SC000360SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERRERA-OSORIO GUIANEYA