This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/24/2019 at 21:32:14 (UTC).

SYLVESTER, CHERI VS BURRUEZO, BARBARA Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 SYLVESTER, CHERI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BURRUEZO, BARBARA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYLVESTER, CHERI

Defendants

OTHER UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

BURRUEZO, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGINS, DANIALLE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

05/22/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

05/22/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

05/20/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF PLTFS COMPLAINT AND ORDER OF POSSESSION AS TO DEFTS FILED BY PLTF CHERI SYLVESTER

05/20/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF PLTFS COMPLAINT AND ORDER OF POSSESSION AS TO DEFTS FILED BY PLTF CHERI SYLVESTER

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/20/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/15/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/07/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

05/06/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR BARBARA BURRUEZO

05/06/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR BARBARA BURRUEZO

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/30/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/30/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF PLTFS COMPLAINT AND ORDER OF POSSESSION AS TO DEFTS FILED BY PLTF CHERI SYLVESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR BARBARA BURRUEZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 425820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case 422019SC002276SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less