This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/21/2020 at 21:33:11 (UTC).

SWIFT, JOHN L VS STONE, SKYLAR A

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 SWIFT, JOHN L filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STONE, SKYLAR A. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT E and LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWIFT, JOHN L

Defendant

STONE, SKYLAR A

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

08/28/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

08/28/2020:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

08/28/2020:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

08/28/2020:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET REGULAR MAIL

08/28/2020:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET REGULAR MAIL

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

08/28/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SKYLAR A STONE

09/08/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SKYLAR A STONE

CORR/MEMO- CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY DEFT SKYLAR STONE

09/11/2020:CORR/MEMO- CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY DEFT SKYLAR STONE

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT SKYLAR S STONE

09/15/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT SKYLAR S STONE

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

09/15/2020:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

09/16/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/16/2020:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

11/06/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION- MOTION FOR DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FOR THE CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT SKYLAR STONE

10/21/2020:MOTION- MOTION FOR DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FOR THE CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT SKYLAR STONE

ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SETTING EVICTION FINAL HEARING VIA ZOOM

10/20/2020:ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SETTING EVICTION FINAL HEARING VIA ZOOM

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

10/20/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT SKYLAR S STONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $1.00 Receipt Number XX 564545

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 10 assessed at sum $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $515.00 Receipt Number XX 564537

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 9 assessed at sum $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 8 assessed at sum $500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $0.45 Receipt Number XX 563970

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESIDENTIAL LEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 559623

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC002835SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 08/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less