This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 07:26:29 (UTC).

SWEENEY, SAM VS MILLER, KIMBERLY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 SWEENEY, SAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MILLER, KIMBERLY. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, JENNIFER LESTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, JENNIFER LESTER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SWEENEY, SAM

Respondent

MILLER, KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BELANGER, KRISTINA

JOSEPHIK, STEPHEN ROBERT

Respondent Attorney

RADUNS, ANNE E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE A FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MARCH 29 2022 AT 130 PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 1/11/2022 AT 230PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketWITNESS LIST FROM PET/SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENGAGING COURT REPORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number XX 677801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase 422021DR003308DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELANGER, KRISTINA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPHIK , STEPHEN ROBERT