This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:56:30 (UTC).

SWEARINGEN, JOHN VS AMSTUTZ, SHAVON

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 SWEARINGEN, JOHN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMSTUTZ, SHAVON. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWEARINGEN, JOHN

Defendant

AMSTUTZ, SHAVON

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED POSTED FOR SHAVON AMSTOTZ

02/21/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED POSTED FOR SHAVON AMSTOTZ

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/13/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND OTHER RELIEF

02/12/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND OTHER RELIEF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

02/08/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

02/08/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

02/08/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SHAVON AMSTUTZ

01/31/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SHAVON AMSTUTZ

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

01/22/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

01/22/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

01/22/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

01/22/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/22/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED POSTED FOR SHAVON AMSTOTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Payment received: $0.15 Receipt Number XX 401409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Assessment 7 assessed at sum $0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Payment received: $1.00 Receipt Number XX 399938

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Assessment 6 assessed at sum $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 394208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case 422019SC000290SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less