This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 13:17:12 (UTC).

SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS FLORKOWSKI, JOHN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against FLORKOWSKI, JOHN. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

FLORKOWSKI, JOHN

Not Classified By Court

AKA JOHN EDWARD FLORKOWSKI,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN LEUVEN, DAVID TYLER

 

Court Documents

MOTION DENIED

10/07/2019:MOTION DENIED

ORDER DENYING PHONE APPEARANCE

10/07/2019:ORDER DENYING PHONE APPEARANCE

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION-REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO PARTICIPATE IN HEARING BY TELEPHONE FILED BY PLTF SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

10/01/2019:MOTION-REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO PARTICIPATE IN HEARING BY TELEPHONE FILED BY PLTF SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

EFILED SUMMONS

09/25/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING

09/24/2019:ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING

MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION AT HEARING

01/28/2020:MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION AT HEARING

ORDER UPON HEARING

01/28/2020:ORDER UPON HEARING

NOTICE-NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

01/27/2020:NOTICE-NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF SUNSTATE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

ORDER UPON HEARING

12/23/2019:ORDER UPON HEARING

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

10/15/2019:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

ORDER UPON HEARING

10/30/2019:ORDER UPON HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL

01/27/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOHN FLORKOWSKI

04/15/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOHN FLORKOWSKI

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

02/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/01/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 397535

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Case 422019CC000110CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less