This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 21:32:10 (UTC).

SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC VS UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

VILLANTE, CARMELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID

 

Court Documents

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLNTF SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC

10/12/2020:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLNTF SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC

10/12/2020:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC

DEFAULT ENTERED

10/09/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/07/2020:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION SEPTEMBER 30 2020

09/30/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION SEPTEMBER 30 2020

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CARMELLA VILLANTE SEPTEMBER 30 2020

09/30/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CARMELLA VILLANTE SEPTEMBER 30 2020

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/29/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLNTF SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF SUMMERFIELD PINES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION SEPTEMBER 30 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CARMELLA VILLANTE SEPTEMBER 30 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 566188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC003095SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less