This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/23/2019 at 21:31:02 (UTC).

STONE, BRENDA VS BURKHOLDER, SHEALYN

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 STONE, BRENDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BURKHOLDER, SHEALYN. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STONE, BRENDA

Defendant

BURKHOLDER, SHEALYN

 

Court Documents

JUDGES WORKSHEET

06/12/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION

06/07/2019:ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

06/07/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

06/07/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/04/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

05/31/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

05/31/2019:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

05/31/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

05/30/2019:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

05/30/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

05/30/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

05/30/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

05/30/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

05/30/2019:EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

05/30/2019:CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/30/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT SHEALYN BURKHOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Payment received: $0.30 Receipt Number XX 434914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 434338

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Case 422019SC002721SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less