This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 11:14:55 (UTC).

STEWART, CHARLES Et Al VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 STEWART, CHARLES filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR and MCCUNE, R JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR

MCCUNE, R JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEWART, CHARLES

STEWART, ELIZABETH I

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN, THOMAS JEREMIAH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/08/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/08/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

11/08/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

11/08/2021:CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/08/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/08/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

12/06/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

12/06/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/14/2021:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER GENERAL CASE TYPE

02/08/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER GENERAL CASE TYPE

ORDER UPON HEARING

02/08/2022:ORDER UPON HEARING

MOTION-MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REOPEN CASE FILED BY PLTFS CHARLES STEWART AND ELIZABETH STEWART

02/09/2022:MOTION-MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REOPEN CASE FILED BY PLTFS CHARLES STEWART AND ELIZABETH STEWART

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketReopened for CIVIL OTHER on 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REOPEN CASE FILED BY PLTFS CHARLES STEWART AND ELIZABETH STEWART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketReopen Date: 02/09/2022; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER UPON HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER GENERAL CASE TYPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 689172

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001515CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan, Thomas J, Jr.