This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/24/2021 at 11:26:49 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I VS SILLS, RICKY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SILLS, RICKY. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD, LANDT, ROBERT E and ROBERT LANDT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

LANDT, ROBERT E

ROBERT LANDT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

Defendants

SILLS, RICKY

TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO, INC.

Not Classified By Court

ASO ANTHONY JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

Defendant Attorney

MOISE, KRYSTAL YEARWOOD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/10/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS

02/10/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

02/10/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS RICKY SILLS AND TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO INC

03/22/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS RICKY SILLS AND TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO INC

NOTICE-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

03/24/2021:NOTICE-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO INC

03/25/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT RICKY SILLS

03/25/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT RICKY SILLS

JUDGES WORKSHEET

03/30/2021:JUDGES WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF STATE FARM

04/21/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF STATE FARM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF STATE FARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/30/2021 13:00; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR; Defendant Attorney: YEARWOOD MOISE, KRYSTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT RICKY SILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS RICKY SILLS AND TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 03/30/2021 at 0100 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 607121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase 422021SC000630SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R