This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/18/2019 at 22:30:19 (UTC).

STAFFORD, ANGIE VS LETENDRE, TRACEY ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 STAFFORD, ANGIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LETENDRE, TRACEY ANN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAFFORD, ANGIE

Defendants

TETRAULT, DONALD

LETENDRE, TRACEY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMESKO, STEVEN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION FILED BY DEFTS TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

04/22/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION FILED BY DEFTS TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFTS TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

04/24/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFTS TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF ANGIE STAFFORD

04/24/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF ANGIE STAFFORD

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

04/27/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

04/01/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

04/01/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION

04/01/2020:NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

04/09/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION SECOND AMENDED FILED BY DEFT TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

05/06/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION SECOND AMENDED FILED BY DEFT TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION

04/28/2020:NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

04/28/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT TRACEY ANN LETENDRE AND DONALD TETRAULT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF ANDREW MESSER MD VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE SECOND AMENDED

05/15/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF ANDREW MESSER MD VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE SECOND AMENDED

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF ANGIE STAFFORD

03/06/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF ANGIE STAFFORD

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS

05/08/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

06/04/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

06/01/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

11/18/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS

06/15/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 424013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Case 422019CA000908CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less