This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/08/2022 at 22:37:03 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC VS CITIBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CITIBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

CITIBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

HINES, SARAH S

THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SPRINGS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SARAH S HIIN

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 2

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 3

Not Classified By Court

NO 7 INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYARS, DAVID ROBERT

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SORINGS SHORES CONDOMINIUM NO 7 INC

06/28/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SORINGS SHORES CONDOMINIUM NO 7 INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SPRINGS SHORES CONDO NO 7 INC

06/28/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SPRINGS SHORES CONDO NO 7 INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SARAH S HINES

06/28/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SARAH S HINES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

06/27/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CITIBANK NA

06/27/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CITIBANK NA

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SARAH S HINES

06/27/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SARAH S HINES

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

06/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

06/14/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

06/14/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SORINGS SHORES CONDOMINIUM NO 7 INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SPRINGS SHORES CONDO NO 7 INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SARAH S HINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SARAH S HINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $960.00 Receipt Number XX 753542

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $960.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001178CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FAIRWAYS AT SILVER SPRINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYARS , DAVID ROBERT