This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/04/2022 at 21:33:07 (UTC).

SP HK APARTMENTS LLC VS MCGRIFF, JASAMINE

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 SP HK APARTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCGRIFF, JASAMINE. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SP HK APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

MCGRIFF, JASAMINE

Not Classified By Court

A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL GEORGE F

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/11/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

05/11/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/16/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF SP HK APARTMENTS LLC

05/25/2022:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF SP HK APARTMENTS LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JASAMINE MCGRIFF

05/25/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JASAMINE MCGRIFF

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF SP HK APARTMENTS LLC

05/25/2022:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF SP HK APARTMENTS LLC

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/25/2022:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/31/2022:DEFAULT ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF SP HK APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JASAMINE MCGRIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF SP HK APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 743721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase 422022SC002032SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SP HK APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS