This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/21/2022 at 06:48:41 (UTC).

SMITH, RANDY LEE VS ALL CLAIMANTS PERSONS PARTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 SMITH, RANDY LEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS PERSONS PARTIES. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN, ROGERS, STEVEN G and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, RANDY LEE

Defendants

WYATT, PAMELA JONES

MONDAY, SUSAN L

WHITE, KATHLEEN

WHITE, ARNOLD

FARMER, BRIAN JAMES

JONES, BERNARD D

ALL UNKNOWN NATURAL PERSONS

THE SEVERAL AND RESPECTIVE UNK

Not Classified By Court

SMITH, RANDY

FARMER, BRIAN

DECEASED,

IF ALIVE OR IF DEAD THEIR UNKN

IF ANY AND ALL OTHER PERSONS O

BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST SA

IF ALIVE AND IF DEAD OR NOT KN

ALIVE THEIR SEVERAL AND RESPEC

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES AND CR

PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR

UNKNOWN NATURAL PERONS

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, ROBERT DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

08/12/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED LIS PENDENS

08/12/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

08/13/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

08/13/2021:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

08/13/2021:EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING

08/19/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING

MOTION-MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF JOE RANDALL DAVIS

08/31/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF JOE RANDALL DAVIS

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

09/10/2021:ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

09/20/2021:ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

09/20/2021:OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

09/29/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH AKA RANDY SMITH

10/20/2021:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH AKA RANDY SMITH

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

10/27/2021:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLS: FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH AKA RANDY SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF JOE RANDALL DAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF RANDY LEE SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $402.50 Receipt Number XX 663987

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $402.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001484CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less