This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 02/21/2022 at 16:25:51 (UTC).

SIOPES, JOAN VS SIOPES, NANCY J

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 SIOPES, JOAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SIOPES, NANCY J. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIOPES, JOAN

Defendant

SIOPES, NANCY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIGLIO-BENKIRAN, MICHELE

Defendant Attorney

EAKES, CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/23/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED LIS PENDENS

12/23/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/23/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

12/23/2021:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED SUMMONS

12/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE FILED BY DEFT NANCY J SIOPES

01/18/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE FILED BY DEFT NANCY J SIOPES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR NANCY J SLOPES

01/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR NANCY J SLOPES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTFS COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY DEFT COUNTERPLTF NANCY J SIOPES

01/21/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTFS COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY DEFT COUNTERPLTF NANCY J SIOPES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM AND REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF COUNTER DEFT JOAN SIOPES

02/10/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM AND REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF COUNTER DEFT JOAN SIOPES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIM AND REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF COUNTER DEFT JOAN SIOPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $395.00 Receipt Number XX 711642

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLTFS COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM FILED BY DEFT COUNTERPLTF NANCY J SIOPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR NANCY J SLOPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE FILED BY DEFT NANCY J SIOPES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $1,915.00 Receipt Number XX 702305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,915.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA002249CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EAKES, CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS