This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:15:15 (UTC).

SILVER CITY FOXES LLC VS ALL OTHERS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 SILVER CITY FOXES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL OTHERS. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III, MCCUNE, R JAMES and THOMPSON III, THOMAS P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

MCCUNE, R JAMES

THOMPSON III, THOMAS P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVER CITY FOXES LLC

Defendants

ALL OTHERS

LINTON, BRANDON

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING

09/24/2019:ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING

CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

11/07/2019:CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE FOR BRANDON LINTON

12/23/2019:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE FOR BRANDON LINTON

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT ALL OTHER

01/18/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT ALL OTHER

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT BRANDON LINTON

01/18/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT BRANDON LINTON

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

01/08/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

01/08/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

01/08/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

01/08/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

01/08/2019:EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/08/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT ALL OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT BRANDON LINTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Payment received: $1.00 Receipt Number XX 391300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Judge: THOMPSON III, THOMAS P Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number XX 390026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case 422019SC000101SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less