This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/23/2022 at 22:46:12 (UTC).

SHIFFER, JILLIAN VS ANY HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES AS Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 SHIFFER, JILLIAN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES AS. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIFFER, JILLIAN

Defendants

ANY HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES AS

MENGINIE, ANTHONY III

OTHER KNOWN PERSON WHO IS DEAD

Not Classified By Court

CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTH

ANY RIGHT TITLE OR INTEREST IN

DESCRIBED BY THROUGH UNDER OR

FLORENCE MENGINIE DECEASED

DEAD OR ALIVE

TO QUIET TITLE IN CERTAIN REAL

RESPECT TO THE INTERESTS OF TH

RECORD,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMURRAY, JUSTIN SCUTT WARREN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/31/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

03/31/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

PETITION

03/31/2022:PETITION

EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY JILLIAN SHIFFER

04/04/2022:EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY JILLIAN SHIFFER

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING

04/14/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED NO MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY JILLIAN SHIFFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $905.00 Receipt Number XX 730929

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA000585CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less