This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/27/2019 at 22:33:06 (UTC).

SHEPHERD, AMANDA VS NEWSON, MARLA A Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 SHEPHERD, AMANDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NEWSON, MARLA A. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEPHERD, AMANDA

Defendants

NEWSON, MARLA A

YORKE, CHARLES A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR CHARLES A YORKE

10/17/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR CHARLES A YORKE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARLA A NEWSON

10/14/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARLA A NEWSON

RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT MARLA A NEWSON

10/11/2019:RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT MARLA A NEWSON

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/03/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/03/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/03/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/03/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/03/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/03/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/03/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/03/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR CHARLES A YORKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARLA A NEWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT MARLA A NEWSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Payment received: $1.15 Receipt Number XX 473409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 470914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Case 422019CA002194CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES