This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/09/2019 at 21:33:06 (UTC).

SHELATZ, ALLYN VS DORSEY, DANIELLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 SHELATZ, ALLYN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DORSEY, DANIELLE. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELATZ, ALLYN

Defendants

JONES, JOSEPH

DORSEY, DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF

05/06/2019:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

05/06/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

05/06/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

05/06/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

05/06/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

05/06/2019:DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

05/06/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JOSEPH JONES

05/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JOSEPH JONES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT DANIELLE DORSEY

05/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT DANIELLE DORSEY

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

04/16/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

MISC- ENVELOPE FROM MAILING

04/15/2019:MISC- ENVELOPE FROM MAILING

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

04/15/2019:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

04/15/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

04/15/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/15/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT JOSEPH JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT DANIELLE DORSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Payment received: $18.00 Receipt Number XX 422576

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MISC- ENVELOPE FROM MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Case 422019SC001927SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less