This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/09/2019 at 22:32:06 (UTC).

SEVERSON, REAH Et Al VS FOWLER, CATHERINE G Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 SEVERSON, REAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FOWLER, CATHERINE G. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEVERSON, THOMAS

SEVERSON, REAH

Defendants

FOWLER, TODD A

MARION PNEUMATICS & HYDRAULICS

FOWLER, CATHERINE G

FOWLER, FRANK R

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTAS, KAREN MELISSA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFTS

10/29/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFTS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTFS THOMAS SEVERSON AND REAH SEVERSON

10/28/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTFS THOMAS SEVERSON AND REAH SEVERSON

ANSWER- ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFTS

10/24/2019:ANSWER- ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TODD A FOWLER

10/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TODD A FOWLER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT FRANK R FOWLER

10/18/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT FRANK R FOWLER

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/16/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/16/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/16/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/16/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

EFILED SUMMONS

10/16/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/16/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/16/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/16/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTFS THOMAS SEVERSON AND REAH SEVERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER- ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARION PNEUMATICS AND HYDRAULICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TODD A FOWLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT FRANK R FOWLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CATHERINE G FOWLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Payment received: $440.00 Receipt Number XX 474586

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Case 422019CA002290CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less