This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/25/2019 at 22:31:13 (UTC).

SCHMIGEL, HALEY C Et Al VS WILLIAMS BENNETT, PAULETTE NAD

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 SCHMIGEL, HALEY C filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILLIAMS BENNETT, PAULETTE NAD. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCHMIGEL, MARY

SCHMIGEL, HALEY C

Defendant

WILLIAMS BENNETT, PAULETTE NAD

Not Classified By Court

A MINOR BY HER NEXT FRIEND MAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVERMAN, TERRY NATHAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

10/02/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

10/02/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS HALEY C SCHMIGEL AND MARY SCHMIGEL

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS HALEY C SCHMIGEL AND MARY SCHMIGEL

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

07/15/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

07/15/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

NOTICE OF SERVICE-OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT, FILED BY PLTF HALEY C SCHMIGEL

09/24/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE-OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT, FILED BY PLTF HALEY C SCHMIGEL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/13/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTFS HALEY C SCHMIGEL AND MARY SCHMIGEL

06/26/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTFS HALEY C SCHMIGEL AND MARY SCHMIGEL

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTFS HALEY C SCHMIGEL

06/26/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTFS HALEY C SCHMIGEL

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS MARY SCHMIGEL

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTFS MARY SCHMIGEL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

05/29/2019:ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER

07/02/2020:ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER

REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION SECOND AMENDED FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

06/01/2020:REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION SECOND AMENDED FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

OBJECTIONS DEFTS REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF HALEY C SCHMIGEL

02/14/2020:OBJECTIONS DEFTS REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF HALEY C SCHMIGEL

REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION

02/17/2020:REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION

MEDIATION REPORT

08/28/2020:MEDIATION REPORT

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

06/13/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

05/29/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT PAULETTE WILLIAMS BENNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT PAULETTE NADINE WILLIAMS BENNETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 428380

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 426119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case 422019CA000962CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less