This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/28/2019 at 21:36:27 (UTC).

SCARBOROUGH, LARRY J VS PELEGRIN, KRISTI

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 SCARBOROUGH, LARRY J filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PELEGRIN, KRISTI. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCARBOROUGH, LARRY J

Defendant

PELEGRIN, KRISTI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/24/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

04/24/2019:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

MOTION- MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT KRISTI PELEGRIN

04/23/2019:MOTION- MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT KRISTI PELEGRIN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED OND EFT KRISITI PELEGRIN

04/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED OND EFT KRISITI PELEGRIN

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

04/05/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

04/05/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

04/05/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE-15 DAYS

04/05/2019:EVICTION NOTICE-15 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/05/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Payment received: $360.50 Receipt Number XX 424076

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Assessment 5 assessed at sum $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT KRISTI PELEGRIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED OND EFT KRISITI PELEGRIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REGULAR MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE-15 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 418196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Case 422019SC001657SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less