This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 02/04/2021 at 22:36:29 (UTC).

SAMUELS, MERL VS POWELL, OWEN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 SAMUELS, MERL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against POWELL, OWEN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUELS, MERL

Defendant

POWELL, OWEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, RUSSELL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR OWEN POWELL

01/27/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR OWEN POWELL

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/11/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/11/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR COPIES

01/11/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/11/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

01/11/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/11/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR OWEN POWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 597544

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000060CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSELL A COHEN