This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 11:12:19 (UTC).

SAMAD, SHEIL Et Al VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 SAMAD, SHEIL filed an Other lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III and THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMAD, SHEIL

SAMAD, SOMATTIE

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Not Classified By Court

DBA SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLESTER, MINDY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/08/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS

11/08/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/08/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/08/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/08/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/08/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF SHEIK AND SOMATTIE SAMAD

11/18/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF SHEIK AND SOMATTIE SAMAD

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

11/18/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

12/06/2021:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

12/28/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTFS SHEIK AND SOMATTIE SAMAD

12/30/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTFS SHEIK AND SOMATTIE SAMAD

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTFS SHEIK AND SOMATTIE SAMAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF SHEIK AND SOMATTIE SAMAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 688962

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001510CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McLester, Mindy