This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 02/21/2022 at 15:19:00 (UTC).

SAMAD, SHEIK Et Al VS CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 SAMAD, SHEIK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM, HODGES, ROBERT W, ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMAD, SHEIK

SAMAD, SOMATTIE

Defendants

CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE CO

Not Classified By Court

AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CA

INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENKINS, KELLY-ANN MCLAUGHLIN

Defendant Attorney

PAUL, MELISSA MORGAN

 

Court Documents

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

02/14/2022:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

01/25/2022:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

01/25/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

01/25/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

01/24/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

01/14/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/14/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/14/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/14/2022:AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/07/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/07/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

12/07/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/07/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/07/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/07/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 708319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA002162CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul, Melissa Morgan