This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 21:34:03 (UTC).

RTO NATIONAL LLC VS SANTOS, HEATHER

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 RTO NATIONAL LLC filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against SANTOS, HEATHER. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT, LANDT, ROBERT E and LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RTO NATIONAL LLC

Defendant

SANTOS, HEATHER

 

Court Documents

INVOICE

10/06/2020:INVOICE

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

10/06/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/06/2020:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ENVELOPE

09/21/2020:ENVELOPE

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

09/21/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION

09/21/2020:CORPORATE AUTHORIZATION

PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN

09/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

09/21/2020:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/10/2020 13:00; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVOICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCompliance INVOICE has been created with due date of 11/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 11/10/2020 at 0100 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE AUTHORIZATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $395.00 Receipt Number XX 566219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $385.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC003097SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less