Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/29/2019 at 22:30:17 (UTC).

ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES WH Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES WH. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LARRY K MEADO

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARRY K MEAD

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES WH

ESTATE OF LARRY K MEADOWS

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Not Classified By Court

MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUS

GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOKOLOF, OWEN HARVEY

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

12/30/2019:PROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION

11/25/2019:EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION FILED BY PLTF ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS/ATTORNEY COPY

12/03/2019:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS/ATTORNEY COPY

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION

11/25/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION

11/25/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FILED BY PLTF ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARRY K MEADOWS

11/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARRY K MEADOWS

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LARRY K MEADOWS

11/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LARRY K MEADOWS

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

11/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ESTATE OF LARRY K MEADOWS

11/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ESTATE OF LARRY K MEADOWS

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF: ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORP.

12/02/2019:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF: ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORP.

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FILED BY UNKNOWN TENANT 2

11/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FILED BY UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

11/05/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/05/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/05/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

11/05/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/05/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARRY K MEADOWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LARRY K MEADOWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ESTATE OF LARRY K MEADOWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FILED BY UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $957.50 Receipt Number XX 480810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $957.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002433CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROUNDPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sokolof, Owen