This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 21:11:04 (UTC).

RIVERA, LIZBETH Et Al VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 RIVERA, LIZBETH filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIERRA, EDGARDO GARCIA

RIVERA, LIZBETH

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTINEZ, ALEXA

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, COURTNEY FREEMAN

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

09/25/2023:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

08/04/2023:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

08/04/2023:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/02/2023:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED FOR MICHAEL HAYNES FIELD ADJUSTER

07/07/2023:SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED FOR MICHAEL HAYNES FIELD ADJUSTER

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

06/28/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

03/20/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

03/15/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANC COMPANY

02/28/2023:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANC COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND WITHDRAWAL OF PRIOR NOTICE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY

02/08/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND WITHDRAWAL OF PRIOR NOTICE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY

CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STIPULATED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN WITH ATTACHED PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED BY PLTF

01/26/2023:CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STIPULATED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN WITH ATTACHED PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER M 2022 35

01/23/2023:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER M 2022 35

ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER M 2022 35

01/19/2023:ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER M 2022 35

REPLY TO DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF EDGARDO GARCIA SIERRA AND LIZBETH RIVERA

01/09/2023:REPLY TO DEFTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF EDGARDO GARCIA SIERRA AND LIZBETH RIVERA

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

01/05/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY

01/03/2023:ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY

MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES FILED BY PLTFS EDGARDO GARCIA SIERRA AND

12/29/2022:MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES FILED BY PLTFS EDGARDO GARCIA SIERRA AND

AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/28/2022:AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED FOR MICHAEL HAYNES FIELD ADJUSTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANC COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES AND WITHDRAWAL OF PRIOR NOTICE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT UNIVERSAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 795212

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002322CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less