This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 02/04/2021 at 22:36:35 (UTC).

RIFFE, KRISTINE VS CRUZ GOMEZ, HUMBERTO

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 RIFFE, KRISTINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRUZ GOMEZ, HUMBERTO. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIFFE, KRISTINE

Defendant

CRUZ GOMEZ, HUMBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARK, GREGORY STUART

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/11/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/11/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 597967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000064CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STARK, GREGORY S. ESQ