This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/27/2021 at 22:34:36 (UTC).

RIBER, CRAIG Et Al VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 RIBER, CRAIG filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT W and HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT W

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIBER, CRAIG

RIBER, MARY

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKRIS, DEAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/03/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/03/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/03/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

11/03/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/03/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/03/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/17/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 688545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA002007CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEAN MAKRIS, ESQ