Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 12/01/2019 at 22:30:34 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC VS SPENA, ROBERT H Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SPENA, ROBERT H. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION O

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT H SPE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SPENA, ROBERT H

Not Classified By Court

ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRET

URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORCE, STEVEN L

 

Court Documents

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

12/10/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

12/10/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

12/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NKA ANN SPENA

12/04/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION NKA ANN SPENA

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT H SPENA

12/04/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBERT H SPENA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ROBERT H SPENA

12/04/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ROBERT H SPENA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

12/04/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

01/17/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/17/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION-MOTION TO VACATE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

06/03/2020:MOTION-MOTION TO VACATE CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

04/02/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

EFILED NOTICE OF SALE

03/18/2020:EFILED NOTICE OF SALE

ORDER ON MOTION CONT SEE DOC

06/09/2020:ORDER ON MOTION CONT SEE DOC

AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

01/17/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT FILED BY PLTF REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST

03/12/2020:NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST

DISCLAIMER BY OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

01/10/2020:DISCLAIMER BY OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $1,945.00 Receipt Number XX 481619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002454CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URBAN DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ACTING TRUSTEE OF THE NORMAN RICHARD MICHAELSON TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Force, Steven L