Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/06/2019 at 22:06:23 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK VS BONHOTE, MARY E Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 REGIONS BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BONHOTE, MARY E. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

Defendants

BONHOTE, PAUL M

TENANT NO 1

BONHOTE, MARY E

TENANT NO 2

Not Classified By Court

BONHOTE, PAUL

BONHOTE, MARY

FAMILY TRUST DATED OCT 23 2018

INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASSEY, STARLETT M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/31/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/31/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

FORM "A"-RMFM CERTIFICATIONS

10/31/2019:FORM "A"-RMFM CERTIFICATIONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/31/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

10/31/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATION OF LOCATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

10/31/2019:CERTIFICATION OF LOCATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Payment received: $462.50 Receipt Number XX 479396

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FORM "A"-RMFM CERTIFICATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION OF LOCATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $462.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Case 422019CA002410CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES P WALKER TRUST UAD MAY 10 1991 AS AMENDED is a litigant

Latest cases where FAMILY TRUSTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M