This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/14/2021 at 17:55:17 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK VS BELLEVIEW SQUARE LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 REGIONS BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BELLEVIEW SQUARE LLC. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM, HODGES, ROBERT W and HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

Defendants

BELLEVIEW SQUARE LLC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROBIN L UPSO

TENANT NO 1

THE ESTATE OF ROBIN L UPSON

TENANT NO 2

UPSON, ROBIN L

UNKNOWN HEIRS UNKNOWN BENEFICI

Not Classified By Court

ROBIN L ORR DECEASED INCLUDING

PARTIES OF ROBIN L UPSON AKA R

UPSON AKA ROBIN L ORR DECEASED

THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST ANY C

OF THE ABOVE NAMED OR DESCRIBE

UNDER OR AGIANST THAT DEFENDAN

AKA ROBIN LEE UPSON AKA ROBIN

LEGAL ENTITY NAMED AS A DEFEND

AND RESPECTIVE UNKNOWN ASSIGNS

DECEASED ANY UNKNOWN HEIRS DEV

PERSONS OR PARTIES NATURAL OR

INTEREST TRUSTEES OR OTHER PER

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASSEY, STARLETT M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS-RELEASE FILED BY PLTF REGIONS BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF REGIONS BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: PROOF OF PUBLICATION DATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/11/2019 11:00; Judge: APPLICABLE, NOT; Docket Type: ONLINE FORCLSR SALE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER TO BE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketReopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 12/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketReopened for CIVIL OTHER on 12/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CANCEL SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF EMERGENCY AGREED MOTION TO CANCEL JUDICIAL FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated Event ONLINE FORCLSR SALE on 12/11/2019 1100 AM - SALE CANCELED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketReopen Date: 12/10/2019; Reopen Close Date: 12/10/2019; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORM "A"-RMFM CERTIFICATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF LOCATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA000776CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less