This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/13/2019 at 21:33:37 (UTC).

RAMOS-MARTE, WELLINTON VS ANDREW, BERL EDWARDS JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 RAMOS-MARTE, WELLINTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANDREW, BERL EDWARDS JR. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS-MARTE, WELLINTON

Defendants

ANDREW, BERL EDWARDS JR

DAVIS WILLIAMS, QUINCELLA FONT

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID

 

Court Documents

CLS: ORDER-TO BE RECORDED

06/04/2019:CLS: ORDER-TO BE RECORDED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

06/05/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

06/03/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLTF WELLINTON RAMOS MARTE

06/03/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLTF WELLINTON RAMOS MARTE

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/03/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/30/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/22/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT BERL EDWARDS ANDREWS JR

05/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT BERL EDWARDS ANDREWS JR

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/20/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/20/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/20/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/20/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: ORDER-TO BE RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLTF WELLINTON RAMOS MARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT QUINCELLA FONTAINE DAVIS WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT BERL EDWARDS ANDREWS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Payment received: $215.00 Receipt Number XX 431679

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case 422019SC002577SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less