This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 21:12:26 (UTC).

PULHAM, AMANDA VS Dollar Tree Stores Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 PULHAM, AMANDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dollar Tree Stores Inc. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PULHAM, AMANDA

Defendant

Dollar Tree Stores Inc.

Not Classified By Court

DBA DOLLAR TREE 4647 A FOREIGN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBLER, NEAL JAY

Defendant Attorney

FREDERICK, CHARLES RACE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT REPORTER

10/02/2023:NOTICE OF COURT REPORTER

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

09/26/2023:ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM

09/22/2023:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM

STIPULATION CASE MANAGEMENT

09/11/2023:STIPULATION CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER

09/06/2023:ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

09/06/2023:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

09/06/2023:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

08/16/2023:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON BARBARA HALVORSEN

08/15/2023:SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON BARBARA HALVORSEN

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

08/14/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

08/11/2023:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

08/11/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

08/11/2023:SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

08/11/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

ORDER ON MOTION- PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

08/04/2023:ORDER ON MOTION- PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

08/02/2023:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

NOTICE- NOTICE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

07/19/2023:NOTICE- NOTICE OF TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

MOTION- MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

06/21/2023:MOTION- MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF COURT REPORTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION CASE MANAGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MEDIATION ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF AMANDA PULHAM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON BARBARA HALVORSEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 795388

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002324CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less