This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/22/2022 at 22:34:39 (UTC).

PROTECTED PROPERTY, LLC VS DITECH FINANCIAL LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 PROTECTED PROPERTY, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DITECH FINANCIAL LLC. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROTECTED PROPERTY, LLC

Defendants

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

DITECH FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

GREEN TREE SERVICING CORP.

LANDMARK ASSET RECEIVABLES MAN

NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT COR

WALTER MANAGEMENT HOLDING COMP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIGLIO-BENKIRAN, MICHELE

Defendant Attorney

FESNAK, HEATHER LYNN

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTIMENT CORP

07/21/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTIMENT CORP

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORP

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORP

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF PROTECTED PROPERTY LLC

07/11/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF PROTECTED PROPERTY LLC

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF PROTECTED PROPERTY LLC

07/11/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF PROTECTED PROPERTY LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WALTER MANAGEMENT HOLDING COMPANY LLC

07/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WALTER MANAGEMENT HOLDING COMPANY LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORP

07/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORP

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GREEN TREE SERVICING CORP

07/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GREEN TREE SERVICING CORP

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

07/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DITECH FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

07/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DITECH FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR LANDMARK ASSER RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT LLC

07/07/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR LANDMARK ASSER RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

06/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTIMENT CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF PROTECTED PROPERTY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY PLTF PROTECTED PROPERTY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDiTech Financial Services LLC dismissed 07/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WALTER MANAGEMENT HOLDING COMPANY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR NEW RESIDENTIAL INVESTMENT CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GREEN TREE SERVICING CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DITECH FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $462.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001314CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROTECTED PROPERTY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where New Residential Investment Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Ditech Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ditech Financial LLC FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC is a litigant