Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/04/2019 at 22:30:34 (UTC).

POWERS, JOANN Et Al VS TODD RHYNE INC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 POWERS, JOANN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TODD RHYNE INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POWERS, MICHAEL

POWERS, JOANN

Defendant

TODD RHYNE INC

Not Classified By Court

DBA RHYNE RESTORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLAPPERT, STANLEY W

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TODD RHYNE INC

10/28/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TODD RHYNE INC

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/11/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

10/11/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TODD RHYNE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 473894

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Case 422019CA002270CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TODD RHYNE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLAPPERT, STANLEY W