This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/21/2020 at 21:36:10 (UTC).

POWERS III, NATALIE S VS ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 POWERS III, NATALIE S filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWERS III, NATALIE S

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

BENNETT JR, SCOTT ALLEN

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

08/28/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

08/28/2020:EVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

08/28/2020:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

08/28/2020:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

08/28/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

08/28/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT SCOTT ALLEN

09/01/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT SCOTT ALLEN

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

09/01/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

MOTION FILED BY DEFTS SCOTT ALLEN BENNETT JR AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

09/04/2020:MOTION FILED BY DEFTS SCOTT ALLEN BENNETT JR AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

09/10/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY PLTF

09/10/2020:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY PLTF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/10/2020:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

09/14/2020:NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

09/21/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

09/21/2020:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT OTHER OCCUPANTS

09/25/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT OTHER OCCUPANTS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEFILED JUDGMENT TO BE RECORDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $8.00 Receipt Number XX 562863

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FILED BY DEFTS SCOTT ALLEN BENNETT JR AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 09/01/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION NOTICE-7 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $219.00 Receipt Number XX 559551

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC002834SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 08/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less