This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 07/16/2020 at 06:40:05 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, VS CARNEY, APRIL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARNEY, APRIL. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR., MCCUNE, R JAMES and R MCCUNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR.

MCCUNE, R JAMES

R MCCUNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES,

Defendant

CARNEY, APRIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERAZA, MANUEL ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/19/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/19/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/19/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

02/19/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

EFILED SUMMONS

02/19/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/28/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR APRIL CARNEY

03/10/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR APRIL CARNEY

ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL FOR THE MONTHS OF MARCH, APRIL AND MAY

05/20/2020:ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL FOR THE MONTHS OF MARCH, APRIL AND MAY

NOTICE OF HEARING TO PARTICIPATE IN REQUIRED REMOTE HEARING

06/11/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING TO PARTICIPATE IN REQUIRED REMOTE HEARING

JUDGES WORKSHEET

06/24/2020:JUDGES WORKSHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

07/02/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

07/02/2020:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

EXHIBIT FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

07/02/2020:EXHIBIT FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

07/20/2020:CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

07/20/2020:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/24/2020 10:00; Judge: MCCUNE, R JAMES; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCompliance ORD TO CLOSE has been created with due date of 07/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGES WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING TO PARTICIPATE IN REQUIRED REMOTE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event SC PTC on 06/01/2020 1000 AM - RESCHEDULED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 06/24/2020 at 1000 AM - Judge R MCCUNE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/01/2020 10:00; Judge: MCCUNE, R JAMES; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 04/07/2020 at 0100 PM - Judge R MCCUNE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 510640

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC000706SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERAZA , MANUEL