This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 14:05:17 (UTC).

PORTER, AARON

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 PORTER, AARON was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT E, THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMAS THOMPSON III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMAS THOMPSON III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTER, AARON

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

SEGT T WYMAN

OFC BARBOUR

J DEBELL WARDEN

G WOODARD ASSIT WARDEN

OFC J MOHS

THE SECRETARY OF FLA DEPT OF C

K MCDAND OR MCDAVID

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFTS

08/27/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY DEFTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/21/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON DEFT DEBELL K WARDEN

08/12/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON DEFT DEBELL K WARDEN

ORDER GRANTING MOTION DEFTS SECOND MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

08/27/2019:ORDER GRANTING MOTION DEFTS SECOND MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED BY DEFTS

08/26/2019:ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED BY DEFTS

MOTION-MOTION SECOND TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFTS

08/26/2019:MOTION-MOTION SECOND TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFTS

MOTION-MOTION TO VACATE INDIGENCY ORDER CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFTS

08/23/2019:MOTION-MOTION TO VACATE INDIGENCY ORDER CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFTS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFTS

06/28/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT OFC J MOHS

06/26/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT OFC J MOHS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT K MCDAVID

06/26/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT K MCDAVID

REQUEST FOR ADMIN REMEDY OR APPEAL FILED BY AARON C PORTER

06/06/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMIN REMEDY OR APPEAL FILED BY AARON C PORTER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SGT T WYMAN

06/26/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SGT T WYMAN

AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT

06/06/2019:AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT

AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/06/2019:AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION-AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND PRISONER AFFDAVIT OF INDIGENCY FILED BY PLTF AARON PORTER

10/18/2019:MOTION-AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND PRISONER AFFDAVIT OF INDIGENCY FILED BY PLTF AARON PORTER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP

04/16/2019:ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PLNTF AARON C PORTER

04/04/2019:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PLNTF AARON C PORTER

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

03/14/2019:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 07/02/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge THOMAS THOMPSON III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION PLTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PLNTF AARON C PORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT-MOTION- PLNTFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND PRISONERS AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 422019SC001277SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Event Date: 07/02/2019 12:30; Judge: THOMPSON, THOMAS P III; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less