This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/29/2019 at 21:32:35 (UTC).

POCKET'S CORPORATION VS AUSTIN, AIMEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 POCKET'S CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUSTIN, AIMEE. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POCKET'S CORPORATION

Defendants

AUSTIN, AIMEE

COLEMAN, ROY VARNELL JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

05/21/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

05/21/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF POCKETS CORPORATION

05/17/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF POCKETS CORPORATION

NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY PLTF POCKETS CORPORATION

05/17/2019:NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY PLTF POCKETS CORPORATION

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR AIMEE AUSTIN

05/14/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR AIMEE AUSTIN

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR ROY VARNELL

05/14/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR ROY VARNELL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/06/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/06/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE

05/06/2019:CERTIFICATE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

05/06/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/06/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF POCKETS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY PLTF POCKETS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR AIMEE AUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR ROY VARNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 427516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Case 422019SC002357SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less