This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/02/2019 at 22:30:10 (UTC).

PINSON, PENNY Et Al VS AUTOMAX OCALA INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 PINSON, PENNY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTOMAX OCALA INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PINSON, PENNY

TAYLOR, AMBER

Defendants

TAYLOR, JENNIFER RENEE

AUTOMAX OCALA INC

TAYLOR, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHOLES, RONALD E.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT AUTOMAX OCALA INC

09/15/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT AUTOMAX OCALA INC

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT AUTOMAX OCALA INC

09/15/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT AUTOMAX OCALA INC

MOTION-STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL TERM

09/08/2020:MOTION-STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL TERM

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/20/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

07/13/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTFS PENNY PINSON and AMBER TAYLOR

09/08/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTFS PENNY PINSON and AMBER TAYLOR

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION-MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVICE FILED BY PLTFS PENNY PINSON and AMBER TAYLOR

09/09/2020:MOTION-MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVICE FILED BY PLTFS PENNY PINSON and AMBER TAYLOR

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF PENNY PINSON

02/26/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF PENNY PINSON

EFILED SUMMONS

09/09/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AUTOMAX OCALA INC

09/15/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AUTOMAX OCALA INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF AMBER TAYLOR

02/07/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF AMBER TAYLOR

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

02/06/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/10/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/10/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

10/10/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/10/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/10/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT AUTOMAX OCALA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 473344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Case 422019CA002259CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less