This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/19/2020 at 23:31:34 (UTC).

PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR. and MCCUNE, R JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR.

MCCUNE, R JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

GADOURY, JANE F

REKULLY, SARAH

Not Classified By Court

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTH

WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD O

DAVIS, JANE F

UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN I

FKA CAPITAL ONE BANK

UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN N

CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP

DAVIS, JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HART, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/26/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

08/26/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED LIS PENDENS

08/26/2020:EFILED LIS PENDENS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/26/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/26/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/26/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/26/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/26/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANE F GADOURY

09/15/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANE F GADOURY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1 NKA SARAH REKULLY

09/15/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1 NKA SARAH REKULLY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2 NKA FLOYD BRAYMAN

09/15/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2 NKA FLOYD BRAYMAN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

09/15/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2 NKA FLOYD BRAYMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1 NKA SARAH REKULLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANE F GADOURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT 2 dismissed 09/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT 1 dismissed 09/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $340.00 Receipt Number XX 558939

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $340.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CC000698CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN N is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant