This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/18/2020 at 23:32:40 (UTC).

PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT E and LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

MCELDOWNEY, KERMIT L

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

BANK OF AMERICA NA

CENTERSTATE BANK OF FLORIDA NA

MCELDOWNEY, LINDA D

Not Classified By Court

UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN N

DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN T

MCELDOWNY, KERMIT

AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRAN

WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HART, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/25/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS

08/25/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

08/25/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CENTERSTATE BANK OF FLORIDA NA

09/15/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CENTERSTATE BANK OF FLORIDA NA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BANK OF AMERICA NA

09/15/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BANK OF AMERICA NA

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

08/25/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/25/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/25/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/25/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

08/25/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

08/25/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EXHIBIT

08/25/2020:EXHIBIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CENTERSTATE BANK OF FLORIDA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BANK OF AMERICA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $462.50 Receipt Number XX 558932

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $462.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CC000696CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/25/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINE RUN OPERATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN N is a litigant

Latest cases where Centerstate Bank of Florida NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant