This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 20:59:24 (UTC).

PHILLIPS, THOMAS VS Marion Fencing AND Constructio

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 PHILLIPS, THOMAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marion Fencing AND Constructio. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILLIPS, THOMAS

Defendant

Marion Fencing AND Constructio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONTICELLO, ANTHONY LEONARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/04/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

11/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF THOMAS PHILLIPS

12/29/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF THOMAS PHILLIPS

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/05/2023:ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT WITH ATTACHED RETURN OF SERVICE

04/05/2023:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT WITH ATTACHED RETURN OF SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

04/05/2023:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

04/10/2023:DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/10/2023:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AMENDED

04/10/2023:DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AMENDED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT 2ND AMENDED

04/10/2023:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT 2ND AMENDED

DEFAULT ENTERED

04/11/2023:DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AGAINST DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC FILED BY PLTF THOMAS PHILLIPS

04/24/2023:MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AGAINST DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC FILED BY PLTF THOMAS PHILLIPS

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/12/2023:NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS PHILLIPS

05/31/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS PHILLIPS

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION CONT SEE DOC

07/18/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION CONT SEE DOC

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION CONT SEE DOC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS PHILLIPS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGEMENT AGAINST DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC FILED BY PLTF THOMAS PHILLIPS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT 2ND AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARION FENCING AND CONSTRUCTION LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
11/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 802158

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 795199

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002321CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less