This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/17/2022 at 22:36:23 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC VS JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

VILLAGE CENTER COMMUNITY DEVEL

SALAZAR, MELISSA A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELISSA A SA

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

MV REALTY PBC, LLC

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Not Classified By Court

A LOCAL SPECIAL PURPOSE GOVERN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER, KATHRYN ISHEE

 

Court Documents

ORDER- STANDING ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND SUBMISSION OF AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN MARION COUNTY

07/25/2022:ORDER- STANDING ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND SUBMISSION OF AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN MARION COUNTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

07/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

07/25/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

07/25/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/25/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $980.00 Receipt Number XX 765625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER- STANDING ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND SUBMISSION OF AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN MARION COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $980.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001501CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A LOCAL SPECIAL PURPOSE GOVERN is a litigant

Latest cases where MV REALTY PBC LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant